U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-04155
  • Case Name: James River Insurance Company v. Deck et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Judgment]
  • April 25, 2019: [Dismiss]
March, 2019
  • March 18, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • March 18, 2019: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • March 18, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 18, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 12, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • March 12, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 12, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 06, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 06, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 04, 2019: [Continue]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 25, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 25, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 25, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 15, 2019: [Response]
  • February 15, 2019: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 15, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 11, 2019: [Order]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 24, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • January 24, 2019: [Protective Order]
October, 2018
  • October 15, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 09, 2018: [Stipulation]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 21, 2018: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • May 15, 2018: [Protective Order]
March, 2018
  • March 08, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 05, 2018: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 01, 2018: [Discovery Report]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [Answer to Counterclaim]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Order for Discovery Report]
  • January 29, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 29, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 25, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 25, 2018: [Counterclaim]
December, 2017
  • December 05, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 14, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 08, 2017: [PHV Fee Paid]
  • November 08, 2017: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 08, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • November 08, 2017: [Filing Fee Received]
  • November 08, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • November 08, 2017: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.