U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-04156
  • Case Name: Smith v. Brown et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Letter Received]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Judgment]
  • March 26, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
February, 2018
  • February 13, 2018: [Letter Received]
  • February 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2017
  • December 04, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2017
  • November 08, 2017: [Letter Sent]
  • November 08, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 08, 2017: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • November 08, 2017: [Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983) (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.