U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30135-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Clairmont
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • April 09, 2019: [Forfeiture]
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: [Judgment Returned Executed]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Declaration of Publication]
  • August 10, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 07, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 07, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 06, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • August 06, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 31, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 31, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 19, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • July 05, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • June 20, 2018: [Forfeiture]
  • June 20, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 23, 2018: [Oral Order for Self Surrender]
  • May 23, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 17, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 17, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 17, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 16, 2018: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 16, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 16, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 16, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 16, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 21, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 21, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2018
  • January 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 02, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 02, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Order]
  • November 20, 2017: [Request]
  • November 20, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • November 14, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • November 09, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 09, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 08, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 08, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 08, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 08, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • November 08, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 08, 2017: [Arrest]
  • November 08, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 08, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 08, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • November 07, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.