U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50168-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Maas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Receipt for Return of Physical Exhibits]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order re Exhibits]
June, 2019
  • June 07, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • June 07, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • June 04, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 03, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • June 03, 2019: [Sentencing]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 20, 2019: [Continue]
October, 2018
  • October 09, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • October 09, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • October 02, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 02, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 02, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Existing Document]
  • September 27, 2018: [Seal Existing Document]
August, 2018
  • August 17, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • August 14, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • August 03, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • June 21, 2018: [Response]
  • June 21, 2018: [Order Referring Motion]
  • June 21, 2018: [Furlough]
  • June 08, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 01, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 01, 2018: [Consent]
  • June 01, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
May, 2018
  • May 17, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 17, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 17, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 17, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 24, 2018: [Extend]
  • April 06, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 03, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • April 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 02, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Request]
  • March 27, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 27, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 26, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 26, 2018: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 20, 2018: [Extend]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Subpoena Issued]
  • February 12, 2018: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • February 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 12, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 09, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • February 09, 2018: [In Limine]
  • February 09, 2018: [Notice]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • January 05, 2018: [Reconsideration]
December, 2017
  • December 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 11, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 20, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • November 08, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 08, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • November 08, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • November 08, 2017: [Unseal Case]
  • November 07, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • November 07, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 07, 2017: [Indictment]
  • November 07, 2017: [Text Order]
  • November 07, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.