U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-04157
  • Case Name: Witte v. Kevin Bitker Trucking, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Judgment of Dismissal (Clerk)]
  • May 28, 2019: [Dismiss]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 15, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 15, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 19, 2018: [Form 52 Report]
  • January 08, 2018: [Order for Discovery Report]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 15, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
  • December 15, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 15, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Affidavit of Service]
  • November 09, 2017: [Filing Fee Received]
  • November 09, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • November 09, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • November 09, 2017: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.