U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cv-05086
  • Case Name: Ferrell v. Thom et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [Order]
  • May 09, 2018: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • May 03, 2018: [Order]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • February 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • February 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
  • February 15, 2018: [Extend]
  • February 15, 2018: [Consolidate Cases]
  • February 15, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 07, 2018: [Extend Deadlines]
  • February 01, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Mail Returned]
  • January 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
December, 2017
  • December 18, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 14, 2017: [Letter Received]
  • December 13, 2017: [Letter Received]
  • December 07, 2017: [Letter Received]
  • December 05, 2017: [Letter Received]
  • December 05, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 05, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 05, 2017: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Letter Received]
  • November 28, 2017: [Letter Received]
  • November 24, 2017: [Letter Received]
  • November 20, 2017: [Letter Received]
  • November 15, 2017: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • November 09, 2017: [Letter Sent]
  • November 09, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 09, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 09, 2017: [Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983) (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.