U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:06-cr-40077-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Transport Leasing/Contract Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 14, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • January 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2020
  • May 18, 2020: [Notice]
May, 2019
  • May 16, 2019: [Order]
  • May 15, 2019: [Proposed Order]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 18, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 15, 2019: [Answer of Garnishee]
  • April 10, 2019: [Answer of Garnishee]
  • April 01, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Post-Judgment Garnishment]
  • March 28, 2019: [Writ of Continuing Garnishment Issued]
  • March 28, 2019: [Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment]
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: [Certificate]
  • December 10, 2018: [Clerk's Notice of Post-Judgment Garnishment]
  • December 10, 2018: [Writ of Continuing Garnishment Issued]
  • December 10, 2018: [Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 28, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 28, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Order]
  • January 12, 2018: [Proposed Order]
November, 2017
  • November 15, 2017: [Answer of Garnishee]
  • November 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.