U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50155-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dethlefs
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • March 22, 2021: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • February 28, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • February 14, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 14, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 14, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 14, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • December 04, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2019
  • October 04, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 27, 2019: [Consent]
  • September 27, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 27, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 11, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 06, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 06, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 06, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2019
  • May 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 17, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 17, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 11, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 11, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2018
  • September 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 27, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2018
  • May 03, 2018: [Consent]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 18, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 18, 2018: [Continue]
March, 2018
  • March 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 02, 2018: [Continue]
January, 2018
  • January 05, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 19, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 04, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 14, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 13, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • November 09, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 09, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 09, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 09, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • November 09, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 09, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 09, 2017: [Arrest]
  • November 09, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 09, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • November 09, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.