U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-04158
  • Case Name: Osterloo et al v. SLM Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 19, 2017: [Judgment]
  • December 18, 2017: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • December 12, 2017: [Notice of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond]
  • December 12, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 11, 2017: [Notice of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 13, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • November 13, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • November 13, 2017: [Filing Fee Received]
  • November 13, 2017: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.