U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-04159
  • Case Name: Creek v. Weber et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 02, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Notice]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Judgment]
  • July 31, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 31, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • July 31, 2018: [Order on Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • July 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2018
  • June 11, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 11, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2018
  • April 02, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 02, 2018: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
March, 2018
  • March 20, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 05, 2018: [Receipt of Initial Partial Filing Fee]
  • February 05, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 05, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • January 22, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 22, 2018: [Extend Deadlines]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 26, 2017: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • December 26, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 19, 2017: [Order]
November, 2017
  • November 14, 2017: [Letter Sent]
  • November 14, 2017: [Miscellaneous Submission (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 14, 2017: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 14, 2017: [Brief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.