U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30155-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kills The Enemy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 09, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 09, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 07, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 07, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • February 07, 2018: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
  • February 06, 2018: [Oral Scheduling Order]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 16, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 16, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • January 12, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 12, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 12, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 09, 2018: [Extend]
December, 2017
  • December 11, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 06, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 06, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • December 06, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 06, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • December 05, 2017: [Order]
  • December 04, 2017: [Stipulation]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 29, 2017: [Request]
  • November 29, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 28, 2017: [Request]
  • November 27, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 27, 2017: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • November 22, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 22, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • November 22, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 22, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 22, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 22, 2017: [Request]
  • November 22, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 22, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • November 21, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 21, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 17, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 17, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 15, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 15, 2017: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • November 15, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 15, 2017: [Indictment]
  • November 15, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.