U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30159-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Potter
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 28, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 27, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • September 06, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 06, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 06, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 23, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • August 22, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 28, 2018: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • June 27, 2018: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
  • June 26, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 25, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 22, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 22, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • June 22, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 22, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 22, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 13, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 13, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • April 25, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 25, 2018: [Order]
  • April 25, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 23, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 23, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 23, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 23, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 23, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 23, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 23, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • April 23, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 23, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 23, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • April 23, 2018: [Request]
  • April 23, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 23, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • April 20, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 20, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2018
  • March 13, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 12, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
December, 2017
  • December 26, 2017: [Detainer Lodged]
November, 2017
  • November 15, 2017: [Indictment]
  • November 15, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 15, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.