U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30158-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Arpan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • October 26, 2021: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
September, 2018
  • September 05, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 05, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 04, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • September 04, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • September 04, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 20, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 20, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 16, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 01, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 24, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • June 19, 2018: [Furlough]
  • June 12, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 12, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 24, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 24, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 24, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 18, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • May 18, 2018: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • May 17, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • May 14, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
April, 2018
  • April 10, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 06, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 13, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 13, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2018
  • January 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 10, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 10, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2017
  • December 08, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Order]
  • November 27, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • November 22, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • November 22, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 22, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • November 22, 2017: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • November 21, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 21, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • November 17, 2017: [Request]
  • November 17, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 17, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 17, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 16, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 16, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 16, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 16, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 16, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 16, 2017: [Arrest]
  • November 16, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 16, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • November 16, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 16, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 15, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 15, 2017: [Indictment]
  • November 15, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.