U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30157-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Turning Heart
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • September 08, 2022: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Judgment - Amended]
  • April 09, 2018: [Judgment - Amended]
  • April 03, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2018
  • March 20, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 20, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 20, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • March 09, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 09, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 09, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 12, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 09, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 29, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 22, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 22, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 21, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 21, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 21, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 05, 2017: [Order]
  • December 04, 2017: [Stipulation]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Request]
  • November 22, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 22, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • November 22, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 22, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 21, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 21, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • November 20, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 20, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • November 20, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 20, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 20, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 20, 2017: [Arrest]
  • November 20, 2017: [Request]
  • November 20, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 20, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 20, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • November 20, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 20, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 15, 2017: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • November 15, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 15, 2017: [Indictment]
  • November 15, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.