U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30152-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jones
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 16, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
August, 2019
  • August 07, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 29, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • July 29, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • July 23, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 22, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • July 17, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 17, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 19, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 08, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 03, 2019: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • May 03, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 03, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 02, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 24, 2019: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 24, 2019: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 24, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 19, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 19, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 01, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 22, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 22, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 27, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: [Request]
  • October 16, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 11, 2018: [Notice]
  • October 10, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 10, 2018: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • October 10, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • October 10, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • August 23, 2018: [Transcript]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • July 16, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • July 16, 2018: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • July 11, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2018
  • June 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 06, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 06, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2018
  • May 02, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 02, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 02, 2018: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • May 01, 2018: [Addendum to Bail Report]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • April 24, 2018: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • April 09, 2018: [Order]
  • April 09, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 06, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 06, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 06, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • April 06, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 06, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • April 06, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 04, 2018: [Request]
  • April 04, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 04, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 04, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 04, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 04, 2018: [Arrest]
  • April 03, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 03, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • April 03, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 03, 2018: [Request]
  • April 03, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 03, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2017
  • November 15, 2017: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • November 15, 2017: [Indictment]
  • November 15, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 15, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.