U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30156-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Black Lance
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 22, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 22, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • May 22, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 21, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • May 15, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 15, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 15, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 10, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 04, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 01, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • May 01, 2018: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 17, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2018
  • March 08, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 07, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • March 07, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 23, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 23, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 23, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 02, 2018: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • February 02, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 02, 2018: [Bail Report]
January, 2018
  • January 09, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • January 09, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • January 09, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 09, 2018: [Oral Order]
December, 2017
  • December 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 12, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 12, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 05, 2017: [Order]
  • December 04, 2017: [Stipulation]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 29, 2017: [Request]
  • November 29, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 28, 2017: [Request]
  • November 27, 2017: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • November 27, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 22, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • November 22, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 22, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 22, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 22, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 22, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • November 22, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 22, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 22, 2017: [Request]
  • November 22, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • November 21, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 21, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 17, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 17, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 15, 2017: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • November 15, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 15, 2017: [Indictment]
  • November 15, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.