U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30153-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bourland
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
February, 2021
  • February 09, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 08, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 08, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 03, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 03, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 22, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 19, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 15, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 30, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 29, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 29, 2020: [Text Order of Detention]
  • December 29, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 29, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 29, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 29, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 29, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 29, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 29, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • December 28, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 16, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 16, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 09, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • July 09, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 09, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • July 03, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 02, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 02, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 01, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 21, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • June 10, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: [Transcript]
  • May 07, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 03, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • May 03, 2019: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • May 03, 2019: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • May 03, 2019: [Verdict]
  • May 02, 2019: [Jury Question]
  • May 02, 2019: [Response to Jury Question]
  • May 02, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • May 02, 2019: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • April 30, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • April 30, 2019: [Jury List]
  • April 30, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • April 30, 2019: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 28, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 28, 2019: [In Limine]
  • April 26, 2019: [Response]
  • April 26, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • April 26, 2019: [Witness List]
  • April 26, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 26, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • April 26, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • April 26, 2019: [Notice]
  • April 25, 2019: [Brief]
  • April 25, 2019: [Notice]
  • April 24, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 24, 2019: [Order]
  • April 16, 2019: [Notice]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • February 25, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • February 25, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • January 24, 2019: [Release from Custody]
  • January 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 18, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 10, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
  • December 13, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 13, 2018: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • December 13, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 13, 2018: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
  • December 12, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 21, 2018: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • November 15, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 30, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 30, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 17, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 29, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 12, 2018: [Consent]
  • July 10, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Order]
  • June 25, 2018: [Stipulation]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 18, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 18, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 01, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 06, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • April 06, 2018: [Transcript]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 22, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 21, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • March 21, 2018: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • March 21, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 20, 2018: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • March 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 13, 2018: [Consent]
  • March 13, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2018
  • February 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • February 06, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 25, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 22, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • January 17, 2018: [Consent]
  • January 17, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 12, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • January 12, 2018: [Transcript]
  • January 08, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • January 08, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 07, 2018: [Oral Scheduling Order]
  • January 03, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2017
  • December 26, 2017: [Suppress]
  • December 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 21, 2017: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • December 21, 2017: [Letter]
  • December 08, 2017: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 06, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 29, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • November 29, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 29, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 29, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • November 29, 2017: [Arrest]
  • November 28, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 28, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • November 27, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 27, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 15, 2017: [Indictment]
  • November 15, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 15, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.