U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30154-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moran
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 03, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
September, 2019
  • September 04, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 03, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • September 03, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 03, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • August 30, 2019: [Witness List]
  • August 29, 2019: [Response]
  • August 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 15, 2019: [Extend]
  • August 08, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 08, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 08, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 05, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 01, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • July 18, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 17, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 03, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • May 23, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 22, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 20, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 20, 2019: [Consent]
  • May 20, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 20, 2019: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • May 17, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 17, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 17, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 17, 2019: [Notice]
  • May 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 15, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 13, 2019: [Consent]
  • May 13, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 08, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 01, 2019: [Consent]
March, 2019
  • March 15, 2019: [Continue]
  • March 14, 2019: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 25, 2019: [Consent]
  • January 25, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Jury List]
  • January 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 22, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 22, 2019: [Jury List]
  • January 22, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 22, 2019: [In Limine]
  • January 22, 2019: [Brief]
  • January 22, 2019: [Notice]
December, 2018
  • December 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 10, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 10, 2018: [Consent]
October, 2018
  • October 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 15, 2018: [Consent]
  • October 12, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 20, 2018: [Consent]
  • August 20, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2018
  • June 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 08, 2018: [Consent]
  • June 07, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2018
  • April 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Consent]
  • March 30, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2018
  • February 14, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 14, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 18, 2018: [Consent]
  • January 18, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2017
  • December 07, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • December 04, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 04, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 04, 2017: [Bail Report]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 28, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • November 27, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • November 27, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 27, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • November 27, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 24, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 24, 2017: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • November 21, 2017: [Request]
  • November 21, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 21, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 20, 2017: [Request]
  • November 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Existing Document]
  • November 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • November 15, 2017: [Seal Existing Document]
  • November 15, 2017: [Unseal Case]
  • November 15, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 15, 2017: [Indictment]
  • November 14, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • November 14, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • November 14, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 14, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.