U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40097-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wiedmeier
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
December, 2020
  • December 18, 2020: [Response]
  • December 18, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 18, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • December 09, 2020: [Supplement]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [Reconsideration]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Reply to Motion Response]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 22, 2020: [Extend]
  • July 13, 2020: [Certificate]
  • July 10, 2020: [Response]
  • July 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 09, 2020: [Extend]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 01, 2020: [Extend]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Supplement]
  • June 22, 2020: [Supplement]
  • June 19, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • June 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 16, 2020: [Extend]
  • June 11, 2020: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 28, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 27, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • August 20, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 20, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 20, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 20, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 10, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 08, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 25, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2018
  • June 07, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 07, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 05, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 05, 2018: [Information - Pursuant to 21 U.S.C. 851]
  • June 05, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 05, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 05, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
May, 2018
  • May 03, 2018: [Notice]
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 16, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 16, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2018
  • March 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 12, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 12, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2018
  • January 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 07, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 07, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2017
  • December 01, 2017: [Response]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • November 29, 2017: [Discovery]
  • November 22, 2017: [Request]
  • November 22, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 21, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 17, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 16, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 16, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • November 16, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 16, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 16, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • November 16, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 16, 2017: [Arrest]
  • November 16, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • November 15, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 15, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 15, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.