U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40058-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • November 18, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
  • November 14, 2022: [Transcript - Public]
  • November 14, 2022: [Transcript - Restricted]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Redacted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 14, 2022: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • October 11, 2022: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • October 11, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 11, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 11, 2022: [Transcript]
  • October 05, 2022: [Transcript]
  • October 04, 2022: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • September 26, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • September 26, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • September 21, 2022: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 19, 2022: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 19, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 19, 2022: [Continue]
  • September 19, 2022: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Transcript]
  • September 06, 2022: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • August 29, 2022: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
  • August 22, 2022: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Acquittal]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 19, 2022: [Notice of Unrestricting Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • July 15, 2022: [Transcript]
  • July 15, 2022: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • July 07, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • July 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 05, 2022: [Acquittal]
  • July 01, 2022: [Sealed Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • June 30, 2022: [Set Aside Verdict]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 27, 2022: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • June 27, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 24, 2022: [Passport - Return of]
  • June 22, 2022: [For Order]
  • June 21, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 21, 2022: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 21, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice]
  • June 17, 2022: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • June 17, 2022: [Verdict]
  • June 17, 2022: [Jury Question]
  • June 17, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • June 17, 2022: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • June 17, 2022: [Jury Instructions]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 15, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 14, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions (attorney use)]
  • June 14, 2022: [In Limine]
  • June 14, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 09, 2022: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • June 08, 2022: [Jury Instructions]
  • June 08, 2022: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • June 07, 2022: [Jury List]
  • June 06, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 06, 2022: [Pretrial Conference]
  • June 03, 2022: [Final Presentence Report]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice]
  • May 23, 2022: [In Limine]
  • May 23, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions (attorney use)]
  • May 23, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 23, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 20, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • May 20, 2022: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 20, 2022: [Vacate (Not 28:2255)]
  • May 17, 2022: [Notice]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order]
  • May 16, 2022: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • May 06, 2022: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 29, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 19, 2021: [Extend]
  • October 19, 2021: [Notice]
  • October 19, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • October 18, 2021: [Continuance Order - 18:3161]
  • October 18, 2021: [Extend]
  • October 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 08, 2021: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • October 08, 2021: [Consent]
  • October 05, 2021: [Continue]
  • October 04, 2021: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 29, 2021: [Response]
  • September 29, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Response]
  • July 15, 2021: [Bill of Particulars]
  • July 15, 2021: [Discovery]
June, 2021
  • June 08, 2021: [Order]
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 11, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 11, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 11, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • May 11, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 10, 2021: [Continue]
  • May 10, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 07, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • April 19, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 13, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • April 13, 2021: [Indictment - Superseding]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 13, 2020: [Continue]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 26, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 25, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 24, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 24, 2020: [Notice]
  • August 21, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • August 21, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • August 20, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 20, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 19, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • August 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Transcript]
  • August 17, 2020: [Response]
  • August 17, 2020: [Transcript]
  • August 11, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 10, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 10, 2020: [Release from Custody]
  • August 05, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 05, 2020: [Consent]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 23, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 23, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 13, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • July 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 13, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 08, 2020: [Extend]
May, 2020
  • May 15, 2020: [Notice]
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • April 15, 2020: [Order]
  • April 14, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • April 14, 2020: [Order]
  • April 09, 2020: [Release from Custody]
  • April 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 06, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • April 03, 2020: [Order]
  • April 03, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • April 02, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • March 11, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 10, 2020: [Objection]
  • March 09, 2020: [Order Referring Motion]
  • March 06, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Show Cause]
  • February 12, 2020: [USCA Judgment]
  • February 07, 2020: [USCA Order (Non-Electronic Record)]
  • February 07, 2020: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • February 07, 2020: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • February 07, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • January 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • January 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • January 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Compel]
December, 2019
  • December 05, 2019: [Request]
  • December 05, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • December 05, 2019: [Objection]
  • December 05, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Response]
  • November 22, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 15, 2019: [Order]
  • November 13, 2019: [Response]
  • November 12, 2019: [Extend]
  • November 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 08, 2019: [Order]
  • November 04, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 04, 2019: [Compel]
  • November 04, 2019: [Supplement]
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • October 15, 2019: [Response]
  • October 07, 2019: [Order]
  • October 04, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • October 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Compel]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 28, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • September 27, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • September 27, 2019: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • September 27, 2019: [Continue]
  • September 25, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • September 24, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • September 23, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 20, 2019: [Notice]
  • September 17, 2019: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • September 17, 2019: [Compel ]
  • September 16, 2019: [Notice]
  • September 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
  • September 04, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • September 04, 2019: [Response]
  • September 03, 2019: [Order]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Response]
  • August 23, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 23, 2019: [Suppress]
  • August 23, 2019: [Bill of Particulars]
  • August 13, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 13, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Disqualify]
  • August 09, 2019: [Response]
  • August 07, 2019: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 07, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • August 05, 2019: [Disqualify]
  • August 05, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 20, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • March 15, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • March 13, 2019: [Consent]
  • March 08, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Transcript]
  • February 27, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • February 27, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • February 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • February 27, 2019: [Order]
  • February 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • February 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • February 27, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • February 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • February 25, 2019: [Continue]
  • February 25, 2019: [Strike ]
  • February 25, 2019: [Objection]
  • February 20, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • February 15, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
  • February 06, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • February 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • February 05, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 05, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 05, 2019: [Extend]
  • February 01, 2019: [Discovery]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: [Certificate]
  • January 22, 2019: [Response]
  • January 08, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 08, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 08, 2019: [Text Order]
  • January 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • January 07, 2019: [Response]
  • January 07, 2019: [Transcript]
  • January 04, 2019: [Discovery]
  • January 04, 2019: [Hearing]
  • January 02, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 02, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 01, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 01, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 01, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 28, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 28, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • December 26, 2018: [Compel ]
  • December 26, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • December 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 26, 2018: [Consent]
  • December 21, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 14, 2018: [Transcript]
  • December 10, 2018: [Order]
  • December 06, 2018: [Order]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Notice]
  • November 30, 2018: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • November 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • November 21, 2018: [Response]
  • November 15, 2018: [Compel ]
  • November 13, 2018: [Request]
  • November 07, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • November 07, 2018: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • November 07, 2018: [Request]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Transcript]
  • October 31, 2018: [USCA Judgment]
  • October 26, 2018: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • October 24, 2018: [Court Reporter Information]
  • October 24, 2018: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • October 24, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory]
  • October 24, 2018: [Order]
  • October 24, 2018: [Objection]
  • October 24, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • October 24, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 22, 2018: [Consent]
  • October 19, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 17, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • October 16, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 12, 2018: [Response]
  • October 12, 2018: [Letter]
  • October 09, 2018: [Objection]
  • October 02, 2018: [Delivered]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • September 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Subpoena(s)]
  • September 24, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • September 24, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 24, 2018: [Subpoena(s)]
  • September 24, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 13, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 13, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 13, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • September 13, 2018: [Extend]
  • September 13, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • September 13, 2018: [Transcript]
  • September 12, 2018: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • September 11, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 05, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 05, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • September 04, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Change of Venue]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 31, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 31, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • August 31, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 28, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 28, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 22, 2018: [Arrest - Other District]
  • August 22, 2018: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • August 14, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • August 07, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 07, 2018: [Change Venue]
March, 2018
  • March 02, 2018: [Consent]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 28, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 14, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 14, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Consent]
  • January 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 23, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Letter]
  • December 27, 2017: [Passport - Receipt of]
  • December 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • December 20, 2017: [Discovery]
  • December 12, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 05, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 04, 2017: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • December 04, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 04, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • December 04, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 04, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 04, 2017: [Arraignment]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • November 21, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 16, 2017: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • November 16, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 16, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 15, 2017: [Arrest - Other District]
  • November 15, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.