U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40051-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lopez-Nicolas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 24, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 24, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • September 14, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 14, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 14, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 22, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • August 06, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2018
  • June 11, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 11, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 04, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 31, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 31, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 16, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 31, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 18, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 02, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2017
  • December 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • December 13, 2017: [Discovery]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 27, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 21, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 21, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 21, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • November 20, 2017: [Response]
  • November 17, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 17, 2017: [Request]
  • November 16, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 16, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • November 16, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 16, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • November 16, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 16, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 16, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • November 16, 2017: [Arrest]
  • November 15, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 15, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.