U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30160-1
  • Case Name: USA v. High Elk
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 18, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 17, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 11, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 11, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 10, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2020
  • June 16, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 16, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • June 16, 2020: [Order on Amended Petition to Revoke]
  • June 09, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 05, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 29, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • April 29, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • April 29, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 29, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 29, 2020: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 28, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • April 27, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 22, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 22, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 17, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 17, 2019: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • December 19, 2018: [Release from Custody]
November, 2018
  • November 16, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • October 26, 2018: [Furlough]
  • October 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • October 02, 2018: [Furlough]
September, 2018
  • September 06, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 04, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 04, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 27, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 21, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 10, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 10, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 10, 2018: [Order]
  • August 09, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • August 09, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 08, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 01, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 01, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 01, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 01, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 01, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 31, 2018: [Notice]
  • July 30, 2018: [Warrant Issued on Revocation]
  • July 30, 2018: [Order for Warrant - Probation Request]
  • July 30, 2018: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 30, 2018: [Request for Warrant]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 21, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2018
  • February 06, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 05, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 29, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 22, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 22, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • January 18, 2018: [Disclosure ]
  • January 18, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 17, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 17, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 08, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 19, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 19, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 19, 2017: [Order]
  • December 19, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • December 19, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 19, 2017: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 11, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 11, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 07, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 07, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 07, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 07, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 07, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • December 07, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 07, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 07, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 07, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 07, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2017
  • November 15, 2017: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.