U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cv-05087
  • Case Name: Miller v. Berryhill
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: [Transcript of Social Security Admin Hrg Received]
March, 2019
  • March 31, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 31, 2019: [Sealed Order]
  • March 31, 2019: [Order on Motion to Reverse]
  • March 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • July 16, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 16, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 18, 2018: [Reverse]
May, 2018
  • May 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • May 14, 2018: [Extend Deadlines]
April, 2018
  • April 09, 2018: [Statement of Material Facts]
February, 2018
  • February 12, 2018: [Briefing Schedule]
  • February 12, 2018: [Transcript of Social Security Admin Hrg Received]
  • February 12, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 12, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: [Affidavit of Service]
  • January 19, 2018: [Acknowledgment of Service]
December, 2017
  • December 15, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • November 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 15, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 15, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • November 15, 2017: [Complaint - Social Security Appeal (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.