U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:08-cr-40121-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Benz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 21, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 03, 2020: [Continue]
  • January 03, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • January 02, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 17, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • December 17, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 17, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 17, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 17, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • December 17, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 17, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 17, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 17, 2019: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • December 17, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • December 17, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
December, 2017
  • December 07, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 07, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 29, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 28, 2017: [Continue]
  • November 22, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 21, 2017: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • November 21, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 21, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • November 16, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 16, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 16, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • November 16, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 16, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 16, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 16, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • November 16, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • November 16, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.