U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cv-03028
  • Case Name: Thompson v. Dakota Southern Railway Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Judgment]
  • October 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • October 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay]
September, 2019
  • September 09, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 09, 2019: [Stay]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • August 28, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 28, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 28, 2019: [Certificate]
  • January 28, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • January 28, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 09, 2019: [Protective Order]
November, 2018
  • November 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 07, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • October 15, 2018: [Extend Deadlines]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • July 13, 2018: [Extend Deadlines]
  • July 13, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
May, 2018
  • May 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • May 07, 2018: [Extend Deadlines]
  • May 04, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 04, 2018: [Extend Deadlines]
March, 2018
  • March 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • March 13, 2018: [Extend Deadlines]
February, 2018
  • February 08, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 07, 2018: [Discovery Report]
December, 2017
  • December 26, 2017: [Order for Discovery Report]
  • December 22, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 22, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 12, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • December 08, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 08, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 07, 2017: [Affidavit of Service]
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • November 16, 2017: [Filing Fee Received]
  • November 16, 2017: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 16, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.