U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30151-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Heideman et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Receipt for Return of Physical Exhibits]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order re Exhibits]
October, 2019
  • October 02, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Judgment - Amended]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Judgment - Amended]
  • August 26, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 26, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • August 26, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 13, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 13, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 13, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 08, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 05, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Certificate]
  • July 30, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • July 30, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • July 16, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 16, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 28, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 15, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 13, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 10, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 10, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 10, 2019: [Extend]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 29, 2019: [Consent]
  • March 29, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 28, 2019: [Consent]
  • March 28, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 15, 2019: [Consent]
  • January 08, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 23, 2018: [Consent]
  • October 23, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 23, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • September 12, 2018: [Request]
  • September 11, 2018: [Request]
  • September 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 04, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2018
  • August 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 11, 2018: [Consent]
  • August 11, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 24, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 23, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • July 23, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • July 17, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 13, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 13, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 13, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 09, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 03, 2018: [Consent]
  • July 03, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • June 25, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • June 20, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 14, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • June 11, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 16, 2018: [Consent]
  • May 16, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 02, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 02, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 24, 2018: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • April 24, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 23, 2018: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
  • April 20, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 20, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 04, 2018: [Order]
  • April 03, 2018: [Order]
  • April 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • April 02, 2018: [Furlough]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 27, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • March 27, 2018: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • March 21, 2018: [Consent]
  • March 21, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 19, 2018: [Consent]
  • March 19, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2018
  • February 09, 2018: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • February 09, 2018: [Addendum to Bail Report]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 29, 2018: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • January 29, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • January 25, 2018: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
  • January 17, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • January 17, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 16, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • January 16, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • January 16, 2018: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • January 16, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • January 16, 2018: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
  • January 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 16, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • January 16, 2018: [Consent]
  • January 11, 2018: [Order]
  • January 10, 2018: [Consent]
  • January 10, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 09, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • January 09, 2018: [Request]
  • January 05, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 05, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 12, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • December 12, 2017: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • December 01, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 01, 2017: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • December 01, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Order]
  • November 29, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 27, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • November 22, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • November 22, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • November 22, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 21, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 21, 2017: [Request]
  • November 20, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 17, 2017: [Request]
  • November 17, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 16, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • November 16, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 16, 2017: [Request]
  • November 16, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 16, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • November 16, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 16, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 16, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • November 16, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 16, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 16, 2017: [Arrest]
  • November 16, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 16, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 16, 2017: [Bail Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.