U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-04160
  • Case Name: Metabank v. Interstate Commodities, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 02, 2018: [Judgment]
  • March 01, 2018: [Dismiss]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • February 15, 2018: [Withdraw]
  • February 15, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2018
  • January 18, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 18, 2018: [Discovery Report]
December, 2017
  • December 08, 2017: [Order for Discovery Report]
  • December 07, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 07, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • November 17, 2017: [Filing Fee Received]
  • November 17, 2017: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.