U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40050-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rodriguez-Venegas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 13, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [USCA Judgment]
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • October 04, 2019: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • October 03, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • October 03, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • October 02, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • October 02, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • September 10, 2019: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • September 06, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 26, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • August 23, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 19, 2019: [Continue]
  • August 19, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 19, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 19, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 05, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 11, 2019: [Continue]
April, 2019
  • April 12, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 09, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 08, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 08, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 21, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 12, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 11, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 03, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 30, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 30, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
October, 2018
  • October 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 16, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • October 11, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 11, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 10, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 14, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 17, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2018
  • May 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 17, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 08, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
March, 2018
  • March 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 14, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Discovery]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 26, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • January 03, 2018: [Discovery]
December, 2017
  • December 01, 2017: [Response]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • November 27, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 27, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 22, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • November 22, 2017: [Request]
  • November 22, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 21, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 21, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • November 21, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 21, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 21, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • November 21, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 20, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • November 17, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 17, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 17, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 17, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 17, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.