U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-04161
  • Case Name: Camberos-Villapuda v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [USCA Judgment]
June, 2019
  • June 04, 2019: [USCA Order (Non-Electronic Record)]
  • June 04, 2019: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • June 03, 2019: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • June 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • May 31, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • May 31, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 07, 2019: [Judgment]
  • May 07, 2019: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • August 14, 2018: [Judgment]
  • August 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • August 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • August 14, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Notice]
  • June 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • June 25, 2018: [Extend Deadlines]
  • June 14, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
May, 2018
  • May 11, 2018: [Response to Motion]
March, 2018
  • March 12, 2018: [Extend Deadlines]
January, 2018
  • January 23, 2018: [Extend Deadlines]
  • January 04, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 04, 2018: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • January 04, 2018: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • January 04, 2018: [Response]
December, 2017
  • December 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • December 18, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 21, 2017: [Letter Sent]
  • November 21, 2017: [Order]
  • November 20, 2017: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (28:2255) (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.