U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cv-03031
  • Case Name: United States of America et al v. Community Coordinated Transport System et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Judgment]
  • January 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 28, 2019: [Notice]
  • January 08, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 08, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • January 08, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2018
  • May 14, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.