U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30150-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Clown et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
November, 2020
  • November 03, 2020: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 20, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 12, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 12, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 01, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 21, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 14, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 12, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 11, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 11, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 11, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • February 11, 2019: [Order]
  • February 11, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 11, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 11, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • February 11, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 11, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 11, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • February 11, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 05, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 05, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 05, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
January, 2019
  • January 15, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 15, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 14, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • January 10, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 07, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • January 07, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 07, 2019: [Order]
  • January 07, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 07, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • January 03, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 03, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 03, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Notice]
  • December 19, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 14, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 14, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 14, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 14, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 14, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 13, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
November, 2018
  • November 15, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 21, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 20, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • August 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • August 10, 2018: [Furlough]
  • August 10, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 10, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 10, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 30, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 27, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 12, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • June 05, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 05, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 01, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 01, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 01, 2018: [Consent]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Competency Report]
  • May 30, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 25, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 25, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 25, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 22, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 22, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 22, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • May 11, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 11, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 11, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 10, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 10, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • April 19, 2018: [Furlough]
  • April 16, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 16, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • April 12, 2018: [Furlough]
  • April 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Competency Evaluation]
  • April 03, 2018: [Competency Evaluation]
March, 2018
  • March 12, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 09, 2018: [Oral Order for Self Surrender]
  • March 08, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 26, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 26, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 21, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 20, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 20, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 20, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 12, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 22, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 18, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 05, 2018: [Consent]
  • January 02, 2018: [Order]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • December 27, 2017: [Consent]
  • December 27, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 22, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 18, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 12, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 08, 2017: [Request]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 30, 2017: [Order]
  • November 24, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 24, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • November 24, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 22, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • November 22, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • November 22, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 22, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 22, 2017: [Request]
  • November 22, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • November 22, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • November 22, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • November 22, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 22, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 22, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 22, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 22, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • November 22, 2017: [Arrest]
  • November 22, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 21, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 21, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 21, 2017: [Bail Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.