U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50169-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McBride
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Order on Amended Petition to Revoke]
  • February 11, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 27, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 25, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 25, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 25, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 25, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 25, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 24, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 24, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
December, 2020
  • December 09, 2020: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
November, 2020
  • November 04, 2020: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 04, 2020: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order on Exhibits]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 25, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 16, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 20, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 17, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 17, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • July 17, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 17, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 17, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 15, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • July 14, 2020: [Consent]
  • July 14, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
October, 2018
  • October 09, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 09, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 05, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
  • October 03, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • October 03, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 26, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 17, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 17, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 17, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 15, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • August 10, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • August 06, 2018: [Order]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 26, 2018: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • June 26, 2018: [Jury Question]
  • June 26, 2018: [Verdict]
  • June 26, 2018: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • June 26, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • June 26, 2018: [Jury Instructions]
  • June 26, 2018: [Jury List]
  • June 25, 2018: [Order]
  • June 25, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • June 25, 2018: [Pretrial Conference]
  • June 13, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 12, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 12, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 12, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 11, 2018: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • April 11, 2018: [Bond Hearing]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 27, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • February 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 16, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 08, 2018: [Request]
  • February 08, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 07, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 05, 2018: [Bail Report]
January, 2018
  • January 16, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • January 11, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 04, 2018: [Request]
  • January 04, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 03, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 03, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 03, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • January 03, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 03, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 03, 2018: [Arrest]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [Indictment]
  • November 22, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 22, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.