U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50170-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cottier
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order on Amended Petition to Revoke]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • July 25, 2022: [Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 29, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 29, 2022: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 28, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 25, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 25, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 25, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Terminate Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Furlough]
  • December 10, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • December 08, 2021: [Furlough]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 18, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 18, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • November 18, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 18, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 18, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 19, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 02, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • June 15, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 07, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 07, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 07, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • June 07, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 07, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 07, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 15, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 14, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 14, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • August 14, 2018: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 10, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • August 09, 2018: [1 - Ex Parte Docket Entry AND Document]
  • August 09, 2018: [Order Referring Motion]
  • August 09, 2018: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 09, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 06, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 06, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 06, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 06, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: [Sealed Response to Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • July 06, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 02, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2018
  • May 01, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 20, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 20, 2018: [Consent]
  • April 20, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 20, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 17, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • April 17, 2018: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • April 10, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 10, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 10, 2018: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 10, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 10, 2018: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 11, 2018: [Consent]
  • January 11, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 22, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 22, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 22, 2017: [Consent]
  • December 22, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • December 22, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 22, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • December 22, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 22, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 22, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • December 21, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 21, 2017: [Arrest]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 22, 2017: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • November 22, 2017: [Indictment]
  • November 22, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 22, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.