U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50172-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wetenkamp
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Notice of Expiration of Probation]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 25, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 20, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • February 20, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 11, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 24, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 24, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 10, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
December, 2018
  • December 10, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
November, 2018
  • November 23, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 28, 2018: [Consent]
  • September 28, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 07, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 07, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 07, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 07, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2018
  • June 11, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2018
  • April 04, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 22, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 06, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • January 17, 2018: [Request]
  • January 17, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 12, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 12, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 12, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 12, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 12, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 12, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 12, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 12, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • January 12, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • January 10, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 10, 2018: [Arrest]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [Indictment]
  • November 22, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 22, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.