U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50175-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Standing Bear
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
April, 2019
  • April 10, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 26, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • March 12, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 12, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 12, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 12, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
February, 2019
  • February 12, 2019: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Evaluation]
October, 2018
  • October 16, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
September, 2018
  • September 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 07, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 07, 2018: [Continue]
August, 2018
  • August 17, 2018: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • August 17, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • August 16, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2018
  • July 17, 2018: [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 15, 2018: [Consent]
  • June 15, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 15, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 04, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 04, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 04, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 04, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 17, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 17, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 26, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 26, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 06, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • December 05, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • November 29, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • November 29, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 29, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 29, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 29, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • November 29, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • November 29, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 28, 2017: [Arrest]
  • November 22, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 22, 2017: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • November 22, 2017: [Indictment]
  • November 22, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.