U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30089-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Davila
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
  • December 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • October 09, 2020: [Response]
  • October 09, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Supplement]
  • September 22, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 22, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
  • September 21, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • September 17, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 17, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
May, 2018
  • May 16, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 15, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 15, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 14, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • May 01, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 01, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 01, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
April, 2018
  • April 16, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 03, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 20, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 09, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 08, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 08, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 08, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
January, 2018
  • January 11, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • January 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 10, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 10, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
December, 2017
  • December 07, 2017: [Information - Pursuant to 21 U.S.C. 851]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 30, 2017: [Order]
  • November 27, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 27, 2017: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • November 24, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • November 24, 2017: [Request]
  • November 22, 2017: [Request]
  • November 22, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 22, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • November 22, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 22, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 22, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 22, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • November 22, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 22, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 22, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 22, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 22, 2017: [Bail Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.