U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-50253
  • Case Name: Tracy Louise Olson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismissing Case]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Affidavit/Verified Statement of Default]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (text entry only)]
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief From Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Case Reassigned]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (deactivated)]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 26, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • April 25, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 14, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 12, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modify Confirmed Plan]
  • April 07, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 01, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • April 01, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 17, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modify Confirmed Plan]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
  • December 11, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • December 03, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Change of Address]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (deactivated)]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (deactivated)]
July, 2020
  • July 02, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Substitute Attorney]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • June 08, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • May 12, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 10, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 10, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • May 10, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - Hrng Held (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • May 10, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan as Confirmed]
  • May 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
  • May 08, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Vacate Order]
  • May 08, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Vacate Order (No Notice Required)]
  • May 04, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • May 04, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan as Confirmed]
  • May 04, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - Hrng Held (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 23, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
  • January 23, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • January 22, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • January 19, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
  • January 19, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Motion to Reschedule Hearing]
  • January 17, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • January 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
December, 2017
  • December 11, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan/Modified Plan]
  • December 11, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • December 11, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income Form 122C-2]
  • December 11, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period Form 122C-1]
  • December 11, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • December 11, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Declaration About Individual Debtors Schedules]
  • December 11, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedules A-J]
  • December 11, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • December 11, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice]
  • December 10, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 08, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Late Notice]
  • December 08, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 08, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amendment of Mailing List with Notice]
  • December 08, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice (Shortened Notice)(DO NOT USE re motion to use cash collateral or to obtain credit)]
  • December 08, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
November, 2017
  • November 24, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • November 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • November 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • November 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • November 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.