U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30161-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fischer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • May 22, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • May 22, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
September, 2019
  • September 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • September 03, 2019: [Forfeiture]
  • September 03, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2019
  • June 07, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 29, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • May 29, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 17, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 17, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 17, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 16, 2019: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • May 16, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 06, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • May 06, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2019
  • March 06, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 05, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 20, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 20, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 20, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 04, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 21, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 21, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 17, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 08, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 08, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 18, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 18, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 25, 2018: [Consent]
  • July 25, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2018
  • June 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 01, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 11, 2018: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 11, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • May 10, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 10, 2018: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • May 08, 2018: [Addendum to Bail Report]
April, 2018
  • April 11, 2018: [Letter]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 27, 2018: [Consent]
  • February 26, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 12, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 12, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 06, 2018: [Furlough]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 24, 2018: [Consent]
  • January 24, 2018: [Continue]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • December 21, 2017: [Furlough]
  • December 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • December 19, 2017: [Furlough]
  • December 12, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 11, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • December 11, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 11, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 30, 2017: [Order]
  • November 29, 2017: [Request]
  • November 29, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • November 29, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 29, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • November 29, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • November 29, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 29, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 29, 2017: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • November 29, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 28, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 28, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • November 28, 2017: [Request]
  • November 27, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 27, 2017: [Arrest]
  • November 27, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 27, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.