U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-30026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. George
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
July, 2018
  • July 03, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 29, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 28, 2018: [Notice]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 27, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • April 27, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 06, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 06, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 28, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • March 23, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 23, 2018: [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
  • March 23, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 22, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • February 22, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 22, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • February 22, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
January, 2018
  • January 04, 2018: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
December, 2017
  • December 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Produce]
  • December 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 14, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 12, 2017: [Produce ]
  • December 07, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 07, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • December 07, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 07, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • December 07, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 07, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 07, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 06, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 29, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • November 29, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 29, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 29, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 29, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • November 29, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • November 28, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 28, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.