U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-30046-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Jakeway et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • September 13, 2022: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 19, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 19, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 15, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 15, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 13, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 12, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 12, 2019: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • March 07, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • March 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • March 05, 2019: [Furlough]
  • March 01, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 01, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
February, 2019
  • February 13, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 10, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • February 10, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 10, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 08, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 08, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 08, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 08, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • February 08, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 08, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2019
  • January 17, 2019: [Order of Detention - DROPS]
August, 2018
  • August 07, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 06, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • July 20, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 20, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 18, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • July 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 27, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • June 27, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 26, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 18, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 15, 2018: [Continue]
  • June 15, 2018: [Release from Custody]
  • June 04, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • May 23, 2018: [Furlough]
  • May 17, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • May 16, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • May 16, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • May 16, 2018: [Order]
  • May 16, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 16, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • May 16, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 15, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • May 15, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 09, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • May 09, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 09, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 09, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 09, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 08, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 08, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Order of Detention - DROPS]
  • November 29, 2017: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 28, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.