U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:07-cr-10002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jensen
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 09, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
February, 2019
  • February 11, 2019: [Judgment Returned Executed]
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 11, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 03, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 03, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 20, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 20, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 09, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 26, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 23, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 23, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 19, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 19, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • October 19, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • October 18, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 10, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 10, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 10, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 10, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
January, 2018
  • January 05, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 05, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 05, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 19, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 13, 2017: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 05, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 05, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 05, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 04, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 04, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • December 01, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 30, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 30, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 30, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • November 30, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 29, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • November 29, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 29, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 29, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 29, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • November 28, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 28, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • November 28, 2017: [Warrant Issued on Revocation]
  • November 28, 2017: [Order for Warrant - Probation Request]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.