U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-50127
  • Case Name: Barbara Lynn Samson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Trustee Following Dismissal (Text Order)]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Final Report Following Dismissal]
May, 2018
  • May 12, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Support Document]
  • May 10, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • May 10, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case (Text Order) Ch 13]
  • May 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
  • May 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • May 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
  • May 08, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 08, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice]
  • May 08, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice (Shortened Notice)(DO NOT USE re motion to use cash collateral or to obtain credit)]
  • May 08, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • May 08, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Sell Property]
February, 2018
  • February 14, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • February 13, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Order Request]
January, 2018
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • January 15, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan as Confirmed]
  • December 29, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - Hrng Held (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • December 28, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • December 04, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.