U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-50257
  • Case Name: Glenn Bradley Foltz
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 15, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
  • December 02, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 01, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Limited Filers only)]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Striking Document]
  • November 29, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • November 29, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.