U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50173-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thunder Horse
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 01, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
April, 2019
  • April 04, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 03, 2019: [Sentencing]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 27, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 27, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 26, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 20, 2018: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • November 20, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 15, 2018: [Extend]
  • October 15, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 01, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 09, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 09, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 09, 2018: [Consent]
  • August 09, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 01, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 01, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 01, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 01, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
July, 2018
  • July 16, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 05, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2018
  • April 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 28, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2018
  • January 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 10, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 04, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 04, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 20, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • December 06, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 04, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 01, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 01, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • December 01, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 01, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 01, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 01, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • December 01, 2017: [Bail Report]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 30, 2017: [Arrest]
  • November 30, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.