U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50171-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Houska
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • June 21, 2018: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • June 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 18, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 24, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 13, 2018: [Extend]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Extend]
  • March 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 14, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 12, 2018: [Extend]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Extend]
  • February 26, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • February 22, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • February 13, 2018: [Extend]
  • February 09, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • February 07, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 06, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 06, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 06, 2018: [Suppress]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 30, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 30, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 08, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • January 02, 2018: [Reconsideration]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • December 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 18, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 15, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 06, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 05, 2017: [Request]
  • December 05, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 04, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 04, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 04, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 04, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 04, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • December 04, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 04, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 04, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • December 04, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 04, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 04, 2017: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.