U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30039
  • Case Name: Hardes Holding, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Exhibits Destroyed]
  • July 12, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Exhibits Destroyed]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
  • June 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
  • June 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Closing Case]
  • June 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt/Acct-Asset]
  • May 26, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt/Acct-Asset]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Allowing Administrative Expense (text order)]
  • March 22, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Allowing Administrative Expense (text order)]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 25, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 23, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Trustee's Final Report and Applications for Compensation]
  • February 23, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Trustee's Final Report and Applications for Compensation]
  • February 23, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt & Applications for Compensation]
  • February 23, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt & Applications for Compensation]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • January 29, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • January 29, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Request for Audio of Hearing]
  • January 29, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Request for Audio of Hearing]
  • January 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Withdrawal of Claim (text entry only)]
  • January 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Withdrawal of Claim (text entry only)]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 23, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Compensation]
  • October 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Compensation]
  • October 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Support Document]
  • October 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Support Document]
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Compensation]
  • September 23, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Compensation]
  • September 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • September 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • September 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Support Document]
  • September 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Support Document]
  • September 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Compensation]
  • September 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Compensation]
August, 2020
  • August 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Compensation]
  • August 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Compensation]
  • August 10, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • August 10, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Attorney]
  • July 31, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Attorney]
May, 2020
  • May 31, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 31, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 29, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Compensation]
  • May 29, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Compensation]
  • May 04, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Compensation]
  • May 04, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Compensation]
January, 2020
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Appeal Order - District Court re: Appeal]
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Appeal Order - District Court re: Appeal]
  • January 09, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 09, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 07, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Compensation]
  • January 07, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Compensation]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • December 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • December 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Compensation]
  • December 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Compensation]
  • December 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Nonstandard Motion]
  • December 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Nonstandard Motion]
  • December 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Report of Sale]
  • December 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Report of Sale]
  • December 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • December 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
November, 2019
  • November 28, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 28, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Appeal Order - District Court re: Appeal]
  • November 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Appeal Order - District Court re: Appeal]
  • November 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Compensation]
  • November 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Compensation]
  • November 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Nonstandard Motion (PRIOR COURT APPROVAL REQUIRED)]
  • November 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Nonstandard Motion (PRIOR COURT APPROVAL REQUIRED)]
  • November 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Amend Order]
  • November 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amend Order]
  • November 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Amend Order (No Notice Required)]
  • November 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amend Order (No Notice Required)]
  • November 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Nonstandard Motion]
  • November 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Nonstandard Motion]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • October 31, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • October 31, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Compensation]
  • October 31, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Compensation]
  • October 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • October 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • October 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Objection]
  • October 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Objection]
  • October 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Service]
  • October 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Motion/Application (Sets Objection Deadline Only)]
  • October 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Motion/Application (Sets Objection Deadline Only)]
  • October 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Nonstandard Motion (PRIOR COURT APPROVAL REQUIRED)]
  • October 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Nonstandard Motion (PRIOR COURT APPROVAL REQUIRED)]
  • October 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Nonstandard Application (PRIOR COURT APPROVAL REQUIRED)]
  • October 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Nonstandard Application (PRIOR COURT APPROVAL REQUIRED)]
  • October 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Nonstandard Order]
  • October 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Nonstandard Order]
  • October 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Compensation]
  • October 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Compensation]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Transcript (Hearing or Trial)]
  • September 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Transcript (Hearing or Trial)]
  • September 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Request for Transcript]
  • September 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Request for Transcript]
  • September 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • September 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • September 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • September 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • September 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Report of Sale]
  • September 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Report of Sale]
  • September 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Nonstandard Motion (PRIOR COURT APPROVAL REQUIRED)]
  • September 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Nonstandard Motion (PRIOR COURT APPROVAL REQUIRED)]
  • September 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Response]
  • September 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Response]
  • September 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Response]
  • September 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Response]
  • September 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • September 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • September 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Nonstandard Motion (PRIOR COURT APPROVAL REQUIRED)]
  • September 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Nonstandard Motion (PRIOR COURT APPROVAL REQUIRED)]
  • September 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Report of Sale]
  • September 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Report of Sale]
  • September 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Compensation]
  • September 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Compensation]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Reminder to File a Document]
  • August 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reminder to File a Document]
  • August 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Compensation]
  • August 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Compensation]
  • August 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Support Document]
  • August 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Support Document]
  • August 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Compensation]
  • August 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Compensation]
July, 2019
  • July 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Compensation]
  • July 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Compensation]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Professional (Text Order)]
  • June 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Professional (Text Order)]
  • June 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • June 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • June 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Request for Certified Copy]
  • June 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Request for Certified Copy]
  • June 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Professional]
  • June 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Professional]
  • June 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement of Conclusion]
  • June 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Appeal - Clerk's Transmission of Record on Appeal (to District Court Only)]
  • May 28, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Appeal - Clerk's Transmission of Record on Appeal (to District Court Only)]
  • May 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Sell Free and Clear of Liens]
  • May 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Sell Free and Clear of Liens]
  • May 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Objection to Proof of Claim]
  • May 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Objection to Proof of Claim]
  • May 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
  • May 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
  • May 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Appellee Designation]
  • May 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Appellee Designation]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Appellant Designation]
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Appellant Designation]
  • April 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement of Issues on Appeal]
  • April 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Issues on Appeal]
  • April 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Appellant Designation]
  • April 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Appellant Designation]
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Approve Lease]
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Approve Lease]
  • April 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Sell Free and Clear of Liens]
  • April 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Sell Free and Clear of Liens]
  • April 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Refund Fee (Text Order)]
  • April 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Refund Fee (Text Order)]
  • April 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Refund Fee (No Notice)]
  • April 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Refund Fee (No Notice)]
  • April 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • April 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • April 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Sell Free and Clear of Liens and Other Encumbrances (fee required)]
  • April 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Sell Free and Clear of Liens and Other Encumbrances (fee required)]
  • April 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • April 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • April 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Service]
  • April 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Reduced Notice]
  • April 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reduced Notice]
  • April 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • April 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • April 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • April 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • April 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Sell Free and Clear of Liens and Other Encumbrances (fee required)]
  • April 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Sell Free and Clear of Liens and Other Encumbrances (fee required)]
  • April 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Reduced Notice (Shortened Notice)(DO NOT USE re motion to use cash collateral or to obtain credit)]
  • April 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reduced Notice (Shortened Notice)(DO NOT USE re motion to use cash collateral or to obtain credit)]
  • April 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Approve Lease]
  • April 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Approve Lease]
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Compensation]
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Compensation]
  • April 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • April 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • April 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • April 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • April 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Appeal - Acknowledgment of Docketing Notice of Appeal]
  • April 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Appeal - Acknowledgment of Docketing Notice of Appeal]
  • April 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Appeal - Transmittal to District Court]
  • April 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Appeal - Transmittal to District Court]
  • April 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • April 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • April 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election (fee required)]
  • April 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election (fee required)]
  • April 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Motion/Application (Sets Objection Deadline Only)]
  • April 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Motion/Application (Sets Objection Deadline Only)]
  • April 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice (Nonstandard)(deactivated)]
  • April 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice (Nonstandard)(deactivated)]
  • April 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Nonstandard Motion (PRIOR COURT APPROVAL REQUIRED)]
  • April 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Nonstandard Motion (PRIOR COURT APPROVAL REQUIRED)]
  • April 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Objection to Claim]
  • April 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Objection to Claim]
  • April 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Order Request]
  • April 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Order Request]
  • April 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
  • April 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
  • April 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • April 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • April 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Response]
  • April 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Response]
  • April 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Nonstandard Order]
  • April 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Nonstandard Order]
  • April 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • April 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • April 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • April 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • April 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • April 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • April 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Administrative Expense]
  • April 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Administrative Expense]
  • April 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Objection]
  • April 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Objection]
  • April 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Objection to Proof of Claim]
  • April 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Objection to Proof of Claim]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Brief]
  • March 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Brief]
  • March 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • March 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • March 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Service]
  • March 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Refund Fee (Text Order)]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Refund Fee (Text Order)]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Response]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Response]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Refund Fee (No Notice)]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Refund Fee (No Notice)]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Reduced Notice]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reduced Notice]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Service]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Reduced Notice (Shortened Notice)(DO NOT USE re motion to use cash collateral or to obtain credit)]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reduced Notice (Shortened Notice)(DO NOT USE re motion to use cash collateral or to obtain credit)]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Sell Free and Clear of Liens and Other Encumbrances (fee required)]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Sell Free and Clear of Liens and Other Encumbrances (fee required)]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Service]
  • March 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • March 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Objection]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Objection]
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Service]
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Motion/Application (Sets Objection Deadline Only)]
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Motion/Application (Sets Objection Deadline Only)]
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Sell Free and Clear of Liens and Other Encumbrances (fee required)]
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Sell Free and Clear of Liens and Other Encumbrances (fee required)]
  • March 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Administrative Expense]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Administrative Expense]
  • March 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Nonstandard Order]
  • March 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Nonstandard Order]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Attorney]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Attorney]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Compensation]
  • February 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Compensation]
  • February 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • February 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • February 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • February 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • February 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Objection to Claim]
  • February 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Objection to Claim]
  • February 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Objection]
  • February 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Objection]
  • February 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Compensation]
  • February 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Compensation]
  • February 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Nonstandard Order]
  • February 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Nonstandard Order]
  • February 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Support Document]
  • February 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Support Document]
  • February 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Change of Address]
  • February 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Response]
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Response]
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Compensation]
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Compensation]
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Objection]
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Objection]
  • February 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Nonstandard Order]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Nonstandard Order]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Professional (Text Order)]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Professional (Text Order)]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Response]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Response]
  • February 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice (Nonstandard)]
  • February 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice (Nonstandard)]
  • February 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
  • February 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
  • February 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
  • February 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
  • February 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • February 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • February 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Nonstandard Order]
  • February 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Nonstandard Order]
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Response]
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Response]
  • February 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Response]
  • February 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Response]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Professional]
  • January 31, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Professional]
  • January 31, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Attorney]
  • January 31, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Attorney]
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Objection]
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Objection]
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Compensation]
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Compensation]
  • January 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Reply]
  • January 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reply]
  • January 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Support Document]
  • January 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Support Document]
  • January 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Objection]
  • January 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Objection]
  • January 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Professional]
  • January 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Professional]
  • January 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Brief]
  • January 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Brief]
  • January 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Attorney]
  • January 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Attorney]
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Compensation]
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Compensation]
  • January 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Transcript (Hearing or Trial)]
  • January 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Transcript (Hearing or Trial)]
  • January 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Request for Transcript]
  • January 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Request for Transcript]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Convert Case 11 to 7]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Convert Case 11 to 7]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • January 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Motion/Application (Sets Objection Deadline Only)]
  • January 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Motion/Application (Sets Objection Deadline Only)]
  • January 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • January 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Response]
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Response]
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Brief]
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Brief]
  • December 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Objection to Claim]
  • December 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Objection to Claim]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Status Report]
  • December 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Convert Chapter 11 to 7 (fee required)]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Stipulated Facts]
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Transcript]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Request for Transcript]
  • November 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Transcript]
  • November 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Request for Transcript]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Extend Time]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • October 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Attorney]
  • September 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Appointment Acceptance]
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Appointment Rejection]
  • September 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Plan Ballot]
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Plan Ballot]
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Court's Exhibit and Witness List]
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Nonstandard Motion (PRIOR COURT APPROVAL REQUIRED)]
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Brief]
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Exhibit and/or Witness List]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Exhibit and/or Witness List]
  • September 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • August 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • August 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • August 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Reply]
  • August 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Approving Disclosure Statement]
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Sample Ballot Form]
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Plan]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Plan Ballot Form (Sample)]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Plan]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Amended Disclosure Statement]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Nonstandard Order]
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appoint Trustee (Ch 11)]
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
July, 2018
  • July 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • July 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • July 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
June, 2018
  • June 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Return of Service ]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • June 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Sample Ballot Form]
  • June 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • June 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Nonstandard Order]
  • June 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Plan Ballot Form (Sample)]
  • June 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Plan]
  • June 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Disclosure Statement]
  • June 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • June 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice (Nonstandard) (Deactivated)]
  • June 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice (Nonstandard)]
  • June 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Response]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Update Plan or Disclosure Statement Deadline(s)]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Motion/Application (Sets Objection Deadline Only)]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection to Claim]
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • April 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Employment of Professional (Text Order)]
  • April 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • April 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Employment of Professional]
  • April 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing]
  • April 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • April 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Employment of Professional]
  • April 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Extend/Limit Exclusivity Period (Ch 11)]
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • March 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Request to Receive Electronic Notice]
  • March 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • March 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • March 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • March 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Evidentiary Hearing]
  • March 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • March 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • February 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Obtain Credit/Incur Debt]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Request to Receive Electronic Notice]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Report of Inability to Appoint Creditors' Committee]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Conclusion]
  • January 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • January 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • January 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • January 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • December 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Employment of Attorney]
  • December 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [List of Equity Security Holders]
  • December 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • December 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Declaration About Individual Debtors Schedules]
  • December 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Schedule H]
  • December 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Schedule G]
  • December 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Schedule E/F]
  • December 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Schedule D]
  • December 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Schedule A/B]
  • December 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • December 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11]
  • December 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • December 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Deadlines]
  • December 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • December 04, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 04, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Authority to File - Ch 11]
  • December 04, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Corporate Ownership]
  • December 04, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [20 Largest Unsecured Creditors]
  • December 04, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 04, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.