U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40108-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Argueta-Montoya
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 05, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 05, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 05, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 05, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • February 02, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • February 02, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 29, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 12, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 11, 2018: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • December 20, 2017: [Discovery]
  • December 13, 2017: [Response]
  • December 11, 2017: [Request]
  • December 11, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 07, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 07, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 06, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 06, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 06, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 06, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • December 06, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 06, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 06, 2017: [Arrest]
  • December 06, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • December 06, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 06, 2017: [Interpreter Needed]
  • December 05, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • December 05, 2017: [Indictment]
  • December 05, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.