U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40107-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Delatorre-Reynoso
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 22, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 22, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 21, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • May 02, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 02, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 02, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
April, 2018
  • April 09, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 23, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 21, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 20, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 20, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 20, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
January, 2018
  • January 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 16, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 16, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2017
  • December 11, 2017: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • December 05, 2017: [Oral Order]
  • December 05, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • December 05, 2017: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.