U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50176-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Reyna-Rivera
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 04, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 04, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • August 09, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 09, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 09, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 13, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2018
  • June 08, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 29, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 04, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • May 04, 2018: [Consent]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 18, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 18, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 18, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 06, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2018
  • March 12, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • March 07, 2018: [Order of Detention]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 28, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 27, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 27, 2018: [Request]
  • February 27, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 26, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • February 26, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 26, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 26, 2018: [Consent]
  • February 26, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 26, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 26, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • February 26, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 23, 2018: [Arrest]
December, 2017
  • December 06, 2017: [Interpreter Needed]
  • December 05, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • December 05, 2017: [Indictment]
  • December 05, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.