U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50174-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Dugan et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 06, 2022: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2020
  • December 09, 2020: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order on Exhibits]
December, 2018
  • December 12, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Transcript]
  • November 27, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 27, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 26, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • November 26, 2018: [Transcript]
  • November 20, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 20, 2018: [Sealed Evaluation]
  • November 14, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
October, 2018
  • October 15, 2018: [Order]
  • October 11, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • October 03, 2018: [Notice]
September, 2018
  • September 07, 2018: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 31, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 31, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • August 30, 2018: [Order]
  • August 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 28, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 27, 2018: [Judgment of Acquittal]
  • August 27, 2018: [Order]
  • August 27, 2018: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • August 27, 2018: [Order for Return of Exhibit(s)]
  • August 27, 2018: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • August 27, 2018: [Verdict]
  • August 27, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • August 27, 2018: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • August 27, 2018: [Response to Jury Question]
  • August 27, 2018: [Jury Question]
  • August 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 27, 2018: [Consent]
  • August 27, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 24, 2018: [Jury Instructions]
  • August 24, 2018: [Order]
  • August 23, 2018: [Jury Question]
  • August 23, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • August 23, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • August 23, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 23, 2018: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • August 21, 2018: [Jury Instructions]
  • August 21, 2018: [Jury List]
  • August 21, 2018: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • August 21, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 21, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 21, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 09, 2018: [Objection]
  • August 09, 2018: [Sealed Order]
  • August 09, 2018: [Pretrial Conference]
  • August 08, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • August 08, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 07, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 06, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 06, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 06, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 02, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 02, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
July, 2018
  • July 20, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 12, 2018: [Brief]
  • July 11, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • July 06, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • July 03, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 03, 2018: [Response]
  • July 03, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • July 02, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 02, 2018: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Order]
  • June 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 25, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 22, 2018: [Extend]
  • June 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 19, 2018: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • June 19, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • June 19, 2018: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • June 18, 2018: [Pretrial Conference]
  • June 18, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 15, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 13, 2018: [Notice]
  • June 13, 2018: [Response]
  • June 13, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • June 08, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • June 08, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • June 04, 2018: [In Limine]
  • June 04, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • June 01, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • May 24, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 24, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 18, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 18, 2018: [Consent]
  • May 18, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 07, 2018: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • May 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 07, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 04, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 04, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 04, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 01, 2018: [Continue]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 30, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 16, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 16, 2018: [Consent]
  • April 16, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 22, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 22, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 22, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 05, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 01, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 22, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 20, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 29, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 19, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 19, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • January 02, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • December 20, 2017: [Release from Custody]
  • December 20, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • December 20, 2017: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • December 18, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • December 11, 2017: [Request]
  • December 07, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 06, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 06, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • December 06, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 06, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 06, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • December 06, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 06, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • December 06, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 05, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 05, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • December 05, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 05, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 04, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.